Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Adelaide

Archidioecesis Adelaidensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Philip Edward Wilson, Archbishop
  • Leonard Anthony Faulkner, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 May 1887
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Australia
  • Square Kilometers: 103,600 (40,015 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.adelaide.catholic.org.au/
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Diocesan Centre, G.P.O. Box 1364, Adelaide, SA 5001; 39 Wakefield Street, Adelaide, SA 5000, Australia
  • Telephone: (08)8210-8108
  • Fax: 8223-2307

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Adelaide
5 April 1842ErectedVicariate Apostolic of New Holland and Van Diemen’s Land Vicariate Apostolic of Adelaide (erected)
Diocese of Adelaide
22 April 1842ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Adelaide Diocese of Adelaide
1845Territory LostDiocese of Adelaide
Archdiocese of Sydney
Vicariate Apostolic of King George Sounde - The Sound (erected)
1847Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of King George Sounde - The Sound (suppressed) Diocese of Adelaide
Diocese of Perth
10 May 1887Territory LostDiocese of Adelaide Diocese of Port Augusta (erected)
Archdiocese of Adelaide
10 May 1887ElevatedDiocese of Adelaide Archdiocese of Adelaide

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Adelaide
195055,000550,00010.0%67371045289057943ap1951
1959120,000750,00016.0%957717269714668165ap1960
1966158,500838,00018.9%939618983818072273ap1967
1970193,137942,28820.5%9710820594219967874ap1971
1980219,0001,079,00020.3%1031102131,02819359576ap1981
1990248,0001,210,00020.5%100921921,291114846077ap1991
1999266,9271,254,75121.3%91861771,508314738277ap2000
2000266,9271,254,92721.3%91831741,534314738256ap2001
2001266,9271,497,63417.8%92851771,508314638276ap2002
2002267,0121,254,43721.3%93781711,561412132775ap2003
2003275,1741,290,78621.3%102791811,520412133575ap2004
2004275,1741,290,78621.3%93601531,798510332667ap2005
2006275,1741,290,78621.3%72631352,038412332467ap2007
2012281,7001,414,00019.9%74651392,026710527261ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013