Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrew Killian

Deceased

Archbishop of Adelaide, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1872Born
4 Jun 189825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Wilcannia, Australia
26 Feb 192451.3AppointedBishop of Port Augusta, Australia
15 Jun 192451.6Ordained BishopBishop of Port Augusta, Australia
11 Jul 193360.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Adelaide, Australia
11 Jul 193360.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ratiaria
5 Nov 193462.0SucceededArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
28 Jun 193966.6DiedArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia

MicroData Summary for Andrew Killian (VIAF: 4201151247993044270006)
Archbishop Andrew Killian (born , died ) Archbishop of Adelaide

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRhode, Offaly, Ireland
Ordained BishopPetersburg

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1924, Number 39
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,893

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast