Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Wilfred Dwyer

Deceased

Bishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1869Born
19 May 189424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Goulburn, Australia
14 Mar 191848.4AppointedBishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia
13 Oct 191849.0Ordained BishopBishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia
11 Oct 193969.9DiedBishop of Wagga Wagga, Australia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Wilfred Dwyer
Bishop Joseph Wilfred Dwyer (born , died ) Bishop of Wagga Wagga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaitland

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast