Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Bach, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati

Titular Bishop of Eriza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1872BornUrmatt, France
30 May 189623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
26 Jan 192754.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)
26 Jan 192754.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eriza
29 May 192754.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eriza
27 Dec 193361.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)
22 May 194370.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Bach:
Bishop Joseph Bach M.S.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013