Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Vincent Dwyer

Deceased

Bishop of Maitland, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1858Born
4 Mar 188223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Maitland, Australia
30 Jan 189738.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Maitland, Australia
30 Jan 189738.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Zoara
6 Jun 189738.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zoara
9 Jul 190950.8SucceededBishop of Maitland, Australia
28 Mar 193172.6DiedBishop of Maitland, Australia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Vincent Dwyer
Bishop Patrick Vincent Dwyer (born , died ) Bishop of Maitland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbury, Diocese of Goulburn
Ordained BishopPro-Cathedral, West Maitland, Diocese of Maitland

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 361, and Page 603
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast