Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael O’Farrell, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bathurst


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1864BornMiltown, Ireland
3 Mar 188722.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
6 Jan 189025.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
16 Jun 192056.2AppointedBishop of Bathurst, Australia
30 Nov 192056.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst, Australia
3 Apr 192864.0DiedBishop of Bathurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for Michael O’Farrell:
Bishop Michael O’Farrell C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Bathurst

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 70
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014