Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Ryan, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1881BornLiverpool, Great Britain
25 May 190725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
30 Jan 192341.5AppointedBishop of Geraldton, Australia
29 Jul 192342.0Ordained BishopBishop of Geraldton, Australia
10 Mar 192644.6AppointedBishop of Sale, Australia
16 Jun 195775.9DiedBishop of Sale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Richard Ryan:
Bishop Richard Ryan C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Sale

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013