Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John McCarthy

Deceased

Bishop of Sandhurst, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1858Born
15 Aug 188324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Galway, Ireland
14 Feb 191758.2AppointedBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
7 Jun 191758.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
18 Aug 195091.7DiedBishop of Sandhurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for John McCarthy
Bishop John McCarthy (born , died ) Bishop of Sandhurst

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFermoyle House, Ireland

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018