Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Shiel

Deceased

Bishop of Rockhampton, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1873Born
19 Jun 189825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
19 Aug 191239.5AppointedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
26 Jan 191339.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
7 Apr 193158.1DiedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Shiel
Bishop Joseph Shiel (born , died ) Bishop of Rockhampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSwainstown, Ireland

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018