Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurence Gaughran

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1842Born
2 Jun 186825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
16 Apr 190663.5AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
24 Jun 190663.7Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland
14 Jun 192885.7DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Laurence Gaughran
Bishop Laurence Gaughran (born , died ) Bishop of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLobinstown

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018