Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Finegan

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1858BornCorlurgan
18 Dec 188123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kilmore, Ireland
4 Jul 191051.9AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
11 Sep 191052.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
25 Jan 193778.4DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Finegan:
Bishop Patrick Finegan (born , died ) Bishop of Kilmore

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013