Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Hoare

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1842Born
11 Jun 186725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
3 Aug 188846.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
3 Aug 188846.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
8 Feb 189552.8AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
19 Mar 189553.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
14 Apr 192785.0DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hoare (VIAF: 315620738)
Bishop Joseph Hoare (born , died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallymahon, Diocese of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)
Ordained BishopS. Mels, Cathedral, Longford

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 118
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 65
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017