Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Boylan, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1842BornTonylion, Kilnaleck
31 Mar 186724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kilmore, Ireland
15 Oct 188846.2ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Mar 190764.6AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
19 May 190764.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
25 Mar 191067.6DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Andrew Boylan:
Bishop Andrew Boylan C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Kilmore

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • pr/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013