Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas McGivern

Deceased

Bishop of Dromore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1829Born
1854²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dromore, Ireland
18 Jan 188757.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dromore, Ireland
18 Jan 188757.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
6 Mar 188757.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
6 Sep 189060.7SucceededBishop of Dromore, Ireland
24 Nov 190070.9DiedBishop of Dromore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas McGivern
Bishop Thomas McGivern (born , died ) Bishop of Dromore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnnachlone, Diocese of Dromore
Ordained BishopCathedral, Newry

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 251, and Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017