Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh McSherry

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa

Titular Archbishop of Amorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1852Born
1875¹22.9Ordained PriestPriest of Armagh, Ireland
2 Jun 189644.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa
2 Jun 189644.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Iustinianopolis in Galatia
2 Aug 189644.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iustinianopolis in Galatia
1 Oct 189644.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa
15 Dec 193886.8RetiredVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa
15 Dec 193886.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amorium
19 Apr 194088.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugh McSherry (VIAF: 315625857)
Bishop Hugh McSherry (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoughgilly, Archdiocese of Armagh, Ireland
Ordained BishopDundalk, Ireland

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017