Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Nulty (McNulty)

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1818Born
6 Jun 184627.9Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
2 Sep 186446.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Meath, Ireland
2 Sep 186446.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
28 Oct 186446.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuria
11 Dec 186648.4SucceededBishop of Meath, Ireland
24 Dec 189880.4DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Nulty (McNulty) (VIAF: 29327023)
Bishop Thomas Nulty (McNulty) (born , died ) Bishop of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFennor, Oldcastle, Diocese of Meath
Ordained BishopNavan

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 195, and Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Mar 2017