Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Kelly

Deceased

Bishop of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1812Born
13 Jun 184027.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 184936.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Derry, Ireland
3 Aug 184936.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
21 Oct 184937.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
18 Jun 186451.8SucceededBishop of Derry, Ireland
1 Sep 188977.0DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Francis Kelly
Bishop Francis Kelly (born , died ) Bishop of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrudgeon

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • bp/bd/ob/s: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 242, and Page 556
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Feb 2017