Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James McDevitt

Deceased

Bishop of Raphoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1831¹Born
18 Jun 185928.4Ordained PriestPriest of Raphoe, Ireland
24 Feb 187140.1AppointedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
30 Apr 187140.3Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
5 Jan 187948.0DiedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James McDevitt
Bishop James McDevitt (born 1831, died ) Bishop of Raphoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlenties, Diocese of Raphoe
Ordained BishopLetterkenny, Diocese of Raphoe

  • a priest for 19.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 476
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017