Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Pius Leahy, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Dromore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1802BornCork
9 Sep 181816.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Aug 182624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Jul 185452.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dromore, Ireland
11 Jul 185452.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
1 Oct 185452.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
6 Mar 186057.6SucceededBishop of Dromore, Ireland
6 Sep 189088.1DiedBishop of Dromore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Pius Leahy:
Bishop John Pius Leahy O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Dromore

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • pr/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 132, and Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013