Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Conaty

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1820¹Born
17 Jun 184828.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 186343.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland
27 Mar 186343.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
24 May 186343.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
11 Apr 186545.2SucceededBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
17 Jan 188666.0DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Conaty
Bishop Nicholas Conaty (born 1820, died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilsallagh, Diocese of Kilmore
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cavan, Diocese of Kilmore

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 329, and Page 481
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017