Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Perth

Archidioecesis Perthensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Timothy Costelloe, S.D.B., Archbishop
  • Donald George Sproxton, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Barry James Hickey, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 August 1913
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Australia
  • Square Kilometers: 427,377 (165,074 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.perthcatholic.org.au/
  • Mailing Address: 21 Victoria Square, Perth, W.A. 6000, Australia
  • Telephone: (08)9223.1351
  • Fax: 9221.1716

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Perth
6 May 1845ErectedArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Perth (erected)
1847Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of King George Sounde - The Sound (suppressed) Diocese of Adelaide
Diocese of Perth
10 May 1887Territory LostDiocese of Perth Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Western Australia (erected)
30 January 1898Territory LostDiocese of Perth Diocese of Geraldton (erected)
Archdiocese of Perth
28 August 1913ElevatedDiocese of Perth Archdiocese of Perth
12 November 1954Territory LostArchdiocese of Perth Diocese of Bunbury (erected)
1982Territory AddedTerritorial Abbey of New Norcia (suppressed) Archdiocese of Perth

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Perth
195085,000425,00020.0%118321505669896768ap1951
1966130,100550,25023.6%120872076281041,08797ap1967
1970140,250700,00020.0%118902086742081,01999ap1971
1980228,446891,44625.6%124832071,10331941,110101ap1981
1990305,0001,110,00027.5%1161122281,3371202693107ap1991
1999379,9021,369,80927.7%1401162561,4834217584103ap2000
2000380,2821,383,50727.5%1381132511,5152209652103ap2001
2001384,0851,395,50927.5%1551102651,4491211652103ap2002
2002384,1851,403,50927.4%1531032561,5001164482103ap2003
2003379,9891,427,95626.6%1471402871,3241199485103ap2004
2004380,0101,427,95626.6%1511362871,3241193503103ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 4 Jul 2013