Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justin Joseph Bianchini

Bishop Emeritus of Geraldton, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1941 Born
29 Jun 196423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
25 Mar 199251.1AppointedBishop of Geraldton, Australia
19 May 199251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Geraldton, Australia
15 May 201776.2RetiredBishop of Geraldton, Australia

MicroData Summary for Justin Joseph Bianchini
Bishop Justin Joseph Bianchini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Geraldton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSubiaco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Geraldton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,680
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,775
  • r: Bollettino, 15 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jun 2017