Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Thomas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Geraldton, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1906Born
13 Jul 193024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sandhurst, Australia
18 Jun 196256.2AppointedBishop of Geraldton, Australia
31 Jul 196256.3Ordained BishopBishop of Geraldton, Australia
13 Jul 198175.2RetiredBishop of Geraldton, Australia
5 Aug 198579.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Geraldton, Australia

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Thomas
Bishop Francis Xavier Thomas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Geraldton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBendigo
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Bendigo

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 112
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 96, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Aug 2021

Quantcast