Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Barry James Hickey

Archbishop Emeritus of Perth, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1936 Born
20 Dec 195822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
22 Mar 198447.9AppointedBishop of Geraldton, Australia
1 May 198448.0Ordained BishopBishop of Geraldton, Australia
23 Jul 199155.2AppointedArchbishop of Perth, Australia
27 Aug 199155.3InstalledArchbishop of Perth, Australia
20 Feb 201275.8RetiredArchbishop of Perth, Australia

MicroData Summary for Barry James Hickey
Archbishop Barry James Hickey (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Perth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeonora

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Perth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jun 2017