Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Joseph Holohan

Bishop of Bunbury


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1947 BornPerth
4 Sep 197124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
11 Jun 200153.8AppointedBishop of Bunbury, Australia
5 Sep 200154.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bunbury, Australia

MicroData Summary for Gerard Joseph Holohan:
Bishop Gerard Joseph Holohan (born ) Bishop of Bunbury

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bunbury.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 28 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,040

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013