Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Joseph Gummer

Deceased

Bishop of Geraldton, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1899Born
31 Mar 192324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bathurst, Australia
24 Feb 194242.9AppointedBishop of Geraldton, Australia
19 Mar 194243.0Ordained BishopBishop of Geraldton, Australia
5 Apr 196263.0DiedBishop of Geraldton, Australia

MicroData Summary for Alfred Joseph Gummer
Bishop Alfred Joseph Gummer (born , died ) Bishop of Geraldton

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerthville
Ordained BishopBathurst, Diocese of Bathurst

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 17
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,852

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast