Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Healy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Perth

Titular Bishop of Mageó


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1925BornCruttinclough, Ireland
5 Jun 194923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ossory, Ireland
195024.4IncardinatedPriest of Perth, Australia
2 Oct 197550.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perth, Australia
2 Oct 197550.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mageó
9 Dec 197550.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mageó
25 Oct 200075.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Perth, Australia
18 Nov 200277.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Perth, Australia

MicroData Summary for Robert Healy:
Bishop Robert Healy (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Perth

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015