Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Denis Stewart

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sandhurst


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1900BornEssendon
8 Dec 192929.3Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
12 Dec 194646.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sandhurst, Australia
12 Dec 194646.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ucres
11 Feb 194746.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ucres
18 Aug 195050.0SucceededBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
21 Apr 197978.7RetiredBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
15 Oct 198888.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Sandhurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for Bernard Denis Stewart:
Bishop Bernard Denis Stewart (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sandhurst

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1947, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013