Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Douglas Joseph Warren

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wilcannia-Forbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1919BornCanowindra
20 Dec 194223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
16 Jun 196445.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
16 Jun 196445.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia
27 Jul 196445.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia
26 Sep 196748.5AppointedBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
30 Mar 199475.0RetiredBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
6 Feb 201393.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia

MicroData Summary for Douglas Joseph Warren:
Bishop Douglas Joseph Warren (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wilcannia-Forbes

  • a priest for 70.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 6 Feb 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015