Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Peter de Campo

Deceased

Bishop of Port Pirie


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1923BornMelbourne
24 Jul 194926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sandhurst, Australia
29 Oct 197956.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Port Pirie, Australia
13 Feb 198056.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Port Pirie, Australia
11 Aug 198057.1SucceededBishop of Port Pirie, Australia
23 Apr 199874.8DiedBishop of Port Pirie, Australia

MicroData Summary for Francis Peter de Campo:
Bishop Francis Peter de Campo (born , died ) Bishop of Port Pirie

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013