Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Morris Clarke

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Maitland-Newcastle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1923BornElsternwick
24 Jul 194925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
10 Apr 197652.6AppointedBishop of Maitland, Australia
2 Jun 197652.8Ordained BishopBishop of Maitland, Australia
3 Nov 199572.2ResignedBishop of Maitland-Newcastle, Australia
3 Jun 200682.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Maitland-Newcastle, Australia

MicroData Summary for Leo Morris Clarke:
Bishop Leo Morris Clarke (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Maitland-Newcastle

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013