Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael John Malone

Bishop Emeritus of Maitland-Newcastle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1939 BornWilloughby
18 Jul 196424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
12 Dec 199455.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Maitland, Australia
15 Feb 199555.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Maitland, Australia
3 Nov 199556.0SucceededBishop of Maitland-Newcastle, Australia
4 Apr 201171.4ResignedBishop of Maitland-Newcastle, Australia

MicroData Summary for Michael John Malone:
Bishop Michael John Malone (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Maitland-Newcastle

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maitland-Newcastle.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,488

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013