Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Justin Daniel Simonds

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Melbourne

Titular Archbishop of Libertina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1890BornGlen Innes
30 Nov 191222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
18 Feb 193746.7AppointedArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
6 May 193746.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
17 May 193746.9InstalledArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
6 Sep 194252.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Melbourne, Australia
6 Sep 194252.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of AntinoŽ
6 Nov 196373.4SucceededArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
13 Apr 196776.8RetiredArchbishop of Melbourne, Australia
13 Apr 196776.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Libertina
3 Nov 196777.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for Justin Daniel Simonds:
Archbishop Justin Daniel Simonds (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Melbourne

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1937, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015