Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Kelly

Deceased

Archbishop of Sydney


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1850BornWaterford
1 Nov 187222.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 190151.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sydney, Australia
20 Jul 190151.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
15 Aug 190151.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Achrida
16 Aug 191161.5SucceededArchbishop of Sydney, Australia
8 Mar 194090.1DiedArchbishop of Sydney, Australia

MicroData Summary for Michael Kelly:
Archbishop Michael Kelly (born , died ) Archbishop of Sydney

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 73, and Page 530
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013