Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Joseph Lonergan

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Port Augusta, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1888Born
30 Nov 191123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
8 Jan 193849.7AppointedBishop of Port Augusta, Australia
14 Jul 193850.3DiedBishop-Elect of Port Augusta, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Lonergan
Father John Joseph Lonergan (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Port Augusta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSouth Melbourne

  • a priest for 26.6 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast