Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Furlong

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1803Born
20 May 182623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ferns, Ireland
9 Jan 185753.9AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
22 Mar 185754.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
12 Nov 187572.7DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Furlong
Bishop Thomas Furlong (born , died ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMayglass, Diocese of Ferns
Ordained BishopEnnis Corty, Diocese of Ferns

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Jan 2017