Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Thomas Toohey

Deceased

Bishop of Maitland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1905BornSydney
30 Nov 192722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
11 Mar 194843.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Maitland, Australia
11 Mar 194843.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
4 Apr 194843.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
4 Mar 195651.0SucceededBishop of Maitland, Australia
24 Sep 197570.6DiedBishop of Maitland, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Thomas Toohey:
Bishop John Thomas Toohey (born , died ) Bishop of Maitland

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015