Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ernest Victor Tweedy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Hobart

Titular Archbishop of Assuras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1901BornNewcastle
20 Dec 192524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Maitland, Australia
17 Dec 194241.0AppointedArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
7 Mar 194341.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
20 Sep 195553.7ResignedArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
20 Sep 195553.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Assuras
27 Sep 196563.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Hobart, Australia

MicroData Summary for Ernest Victor Tweedy:
Archbishop Ernest Victor Tweedy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hobart

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations piscopales, Issue 1943, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015