Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Bernard Bird, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Ballarat


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1949 BornNewcastle
11 Feb 196818.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
17 May 197525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Aug 201263.0AppointedBishop of Ballarat, Australia
16 Oct 201263.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ballarat, Australia

MicroData Summary for Paul Bernard Bird:
Bishop Paul Bernard Bird C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Ballarat

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ballarat.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2012
  • c2+: CB, 15 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,602

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013