Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Giuseppe Doebbing, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1855BornMünster
22 Jun 187924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Apr 190044.7AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
22 Apr 190044.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
14 Mar 191660.7DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Giuseppe Doebbing:
Bishop Bernardo Giuseppe Doebbing O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 409

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013