Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Valerio Valeri, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1865Born
28 Apr 188822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Apr 191044.4AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
5 Jun 191044.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
14 Aug 194276.8RetiredArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
14 Aug 194276.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria
20 Nov 195085.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Valerio Valeri
Archbishop Tommaso Valerio Valeri O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Fiora

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,951
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,910, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast