Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Orazio Semeraro

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi

Titular Archbishop of Falerii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1906BornVeglie
11 Aug 192923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Brindisi, Italy
22 Mar 195750.9AppointedBishop of Cariati, Italy
10 May 195751.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati, Italy
30 Apr 196761.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy
30 Apr 196761.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Falerii
24 May 197569.1ResignedCoadjutor Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy
22 Aug 199185.3DiedCoadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Orazio Semeraro:
Archbishop Orazio Semeraro (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Brindisi

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015