Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dario Mattei-Gentili

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Perugia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1842Born
14 Aug 186422.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188038.0AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
29 Feb 188038.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
1 Jun 189149.3AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
29 Nov 189553.8AppointedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
30 Sep 191068.6ResignedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
8 Jan 191269.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dario Mattei-Gentili (VIAF: 90302331)
Archbishop Dario Mattei-Gentili (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Perugia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePennabilli
Ordained BishopS. Apollinare, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 207, and Page 448
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 503
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Mar 2017