Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria Filippo Sinibaldi

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1846Born
14 Dec 190458.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
14 Dec 190458.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
18 Dec 190458.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
16 Apr 191569.0AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
20 Apr 192882.0DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Filippo Sinibaldi
Bishop Angelo Maria Filippo Sinibaldi (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGavignano

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018