Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Amilcare Tonietti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montalcino

Titular Archbishop of Tyana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1847BornRio Marino
23 Sep 187124.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 188740.4AppointedBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
8 Dec 188740.5Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Carrara, Italy
12 Jun 189346.0AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
25 Sep 189952.3ResignedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
25 Sep 189952.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
22 Mar 192779.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Montalcino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Amilcare Tonietti:
Archbishop Amilcare Tonietti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montalcino

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 319, and Page 372
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 573

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013