Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elia Bianchi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nicosia

Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1820Born
1 Jan 184625.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Jan 184625.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 187958.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
12 May 187958.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
25 May 187958.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
3 Jul 188261.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
7 Sep 188968.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

MicroData Summary for Elia Bianchi
Archbishop Elia Bianchi (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nicosia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlessandria, Vicariate Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
Ordained BishopSt Roch, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1886, Page 305
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 414, and Page 534
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017