Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tancredo Fausti

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1831Born
22 Dec 185524.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 188958.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
24 Feb 188958.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
23 Sep 189564.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria

MicroData Summary for Tancredo Fausti
Archbishop Tancredo Fausti (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 511
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017