Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Castracane degli Antelminelli

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1851Born
25 Sep 189140.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
11 Oct 189140.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
18 Jun 189443.2AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
189846.7ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
21 Aug 189948.4DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Castracane degli Antelminelli
Archbishop Filippo Castracane degli Antelminelli (born , died ) President Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagli, Diocese of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
Ordained BishopTor de Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 256
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1891, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017