Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Baptiste Olaf Fallize

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)

Titular Archbishop of Chalcis in Graecia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1844Born
8 Apr 187126.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 188742.5AppointedPrefect of Norvegia
15 Mar 189247.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)
15 Mar 189247.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
19 Mar 189247.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elusa
21 Jun 192277.6RetiredVicar Apostolic of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)
9 Oct 192277.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcis in Graecia
23 Oct 193388.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)

MicroData Summary for Johannes Baptiste Olaf Fallize (VIAF: 170348312)
Archbishop Johannes Baptiste Olaf Fallize (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBettingen, Vicariate Apostolic of Luxembourg
Ordained BishopGerman College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 258
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017