Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Oslo

Dioecesis OsloŽnsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Bernt Ivar (Markus) Eidsvig, C.R.S.A., Bishop
  • Gerhard Schwenzer, SS.CC., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 29 June 1953
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Norway
  • Square Kilometers: 154,560 (59,698 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.katolsk.no/
  • Mailing Address: Akersveien 5, Postboks 8270, 1 N-0177 Oslo, Norge
  • Telephone: 23.21.95.00
  • Fax: 23.21.95.01

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Norvegia (unknown)
7 August 1868ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nordic Missions Mission "Sui Iuris" of Norvegia (unknown) (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Norvegia
17 August 1869ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Norvegia (unknown) Prefecture Apostolic of Norvegia
11 March 1892ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Norvegia
Vicariate Apostolic of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)
17 August 1892ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen)
Vicariate Apostolic of Oslo
10 April 1931Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Norvegia (e Spitzbergen) Vicariate Apostolic of Oslo
Diocese of Oslo
29 June 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Oslo Diocese of Oslo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Oslo
19503,8102,264,000.2%2115361051248315ap1951
Diocese of Oslo
19708,3192,808,401.3%2228501663038517ap1971
198012,5823,007,000.4%2130512463130117ap1981
199030,0953,157,2691.0%1430446833521618ap1991
199940,5653,600,0001.1%19234296533216620ap2000
200043,9803,236,1211.4%22305284533915320ap2001
200147,6803,410,0001.4%25285389933514420ap2002
200248,5143,423,4281.4%23275097033413520ap2003
200349,5953,449,2861.4%23285197233712820ap2004
200451,3053,449,2861.5%21345593233913220ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013